+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On January 8, 2014 in the House:
- Inexpedient to Legislate MA VV
On November 25, 2013 in the House:
- Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Jan 8 (Vote 18-0; CC); HC 1
On October 18, 2013 in the House:
- Retained Bill-Executive Session: 11/12/2013 10:00 AM LOB 304
- Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 10/30/2013 1:00 PM LOB 304
On October 16, 2013 in the House:
- ===CANCELLED=== Work Session: 10/23/2013 10:00 AM LOB 304
- Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 10/23/2013 10:00 AM LOB 304
On September 25, 2013 in the House:
- Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 10/16/2013 10:00 AM LOB 304
On September 9, 2013 in the House:
- Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 9/25/2013 1:00 PM LOB 304
On March 5, 2013 in the House:
- Retained in Committee
On February 27, 2013 in the House:
- Continued Executive Session: 3/5/2013 1:00 PM LOB 304
On February 14, 2013 in the House:
- Executive Session: 2/26/2013 1:00 PM LOB 304 ==RECESSED==
On February 13, 2013 in the House:
- Full Committee Work Session: 2/21/2013 2:00 PM LOB 304
On January 30, 2013 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 2/12/2013 2:00 PM Representatives Hall
On January 3, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced 1/3/2013 and Referred to Science, Technology and Energy; HJ 12, PG.196
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor