+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (15)
On May 19, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by Governor Sununu 05/17/2021; Chapter 44; Eff: 05/17/2021
On May 6, 2021 in the Senate:
- Enrolled RC 23Y-0N, MA, (In recess of 05/06/2021); SJ 15
On May 6, 2021 in the House:
- Enrolled (in recess of) 04/09/2021 HJ 7 P. 102
On April 22, 2021 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2021-1168e: AA VV (in recess of) 04/09/2021 HJ 7 P. 100
On April 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2021-1168e RC 24Y-0N, AA, (In recess of 04/08/2021); SJ 12
On April 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Ought to Pass: RC 23Y-1N, MA; OT3rdg; 04/08/2021; SJ 11
On March 31, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 04/08/2021; Vote 5-0; CC; SC 18
On March 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Remote Hearing: 03/23/2021, 09:15 am; Links to join the hearing can be found in the Senate Calendar; SC 16
On March 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced 03/04/2021 and Referred to Education; SJ 7
On February 24, 2021 in the House:
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 2021-0383h: MA VV 02/24/2021 HJ 3 P. 6
- Amendment # 2021-0383h: AA VV 02/24/2021 HJ 3 P. 6
On February 18, 2021 in the House:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2021-0383h (Vote 20-0; CC) HC 12 P. 4
- Executive Session: 02/18/2021 09:00 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/95029670134
On January 20, 2021 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 01/26/2021 01:00 pm Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/91325381640 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened.
On January 10, 2021 in the House:
- Introduced (in recess of) 01/06/2021 and referred to Education HJ 2 P. 48