+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On March 22, 2023 in the House:
- Inexpedient to Legislate: MA VV 03/22/2023 HJ 10 P. 2
On March 16, 2023 in the House:
- Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate 03/15/2023 (Vote 16-0; CC) HC 16 P. 3
On March 13, 2023 in the House:
- Executive Session: 03/15/2023 10:15 am LOB 305-307
On March 8, 2023 in the House:
- ==CONTINUED== Executive Session: 03/15/2023 10:15 am LOB 305-307
On February 16, 2023 in the House:
- Executive Session: 03/07/2023 09:30 am LOB 206-208
On January 19, 2023 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 01/24/2023 11:30 am LOB 206-208
On January 11, 2023 in the House:
- Introduced (in recess of) 01/05/2023 and referred to Children and Family Law HJ 3 P. 16
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor