+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On February 20, 2013 in the House:
- Inexpedient to Legislate: MA VV; HJ 21, PG.467
On February 13, 2013 in the House:
- Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Feb 20 (Vote 16-0; CC); HC 15, PG.267
On February 6, 2013 in the House:
- Executive Session: 2/12/2013 10:00 AM LOB 301
On January 23, 2013 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 1/31/2013 11:00 AM LOB 301
On January 3, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced 1/3/2013 and Referred to Municipal and County Government; HJ 12, PG.195
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor