+ − Actions (9)
On April 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 04/22/2021; SC 20
On April 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Remote Hearing: 04/12/2021, 02:15 pm; Links to join the hearing can be found in the Senate Calendar; SC 19
- Introduced 04/01/2021 and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources; SJ 11
On April 7, 2021 in the House:
- Reconsider (Rep. Osborne): MF VV 04/07/2021 HJ 5 P. 50
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 2021-0404h: MA VV 04/07/2021 HJ 5 P. 20
- Amendment # 2021-0404h: AA VV 04/07/2021 HJ 5 P. 20
On February 18, 2021 in the House:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2021-0404h (Vote 19-0; CC) HC 18 P. 11
On February 8, 2021 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 02/17/2021 01:00 pm Members of the public may attend using the following link: To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/97165419816 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened.
On January 10, 2021 in the House:
- Introduced (in recess of) 01/06/2021 and referred to Environment and Agriculture HJ 2 P. 48
+ − Amendment
+ − Vote
April 22, 2021: Ought to Pass
- Yeas: 24
- Present/NV: 24
Details:
+
−
- Jeb Bradley: Yea
- David Watters: Yea
- Sharon Carson: Yea
- John Reagan: Yea
- Donna Soucy: Yea
- Lou D'Allesandro: Yea
- Chuck Morse: Yea
- Regina Birdsell: Yea
- Gary Daniels: Yea
- James Gray: Yea
- Cindy Rosenwald: Yea
- Kevin Avard: Yea
- Harold French: Yea
- Erin Hennessey: Yea
- Bob Giuda: Yea
- Ruth Ward: Yea
- Jay Kahn: Yea
- Kevin Cavanaugh: Yea
- Tom Sherman: Yea
- Suzanne Prentiss: Yea
- Rebecca Whitley: Yea
- Bill Gannon: Yea
- Rebecca Perkins Kwoka: Yea
- Denise Ricciardi: Yea
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor