+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On November 16, 2017 in the House:
- Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 26-0; CC)
On October 19, 2017 in the House:
- Executive Session: 11/08/2017 10:00 AM LOB 210-211
On September 20, 2017 in the House:
- Retained Bill Division I Work Session: 09/28/2017 10:35 AM LOB 212
On March 16, 2017 in the House:
- Retained in Committee
On March 1, 2017 in the House:
- Executive Session: 03/13/2017 10:00 AM LOB 210-211
On February 23, 2017 in the House:
- Division I Work Session: 03/02/2017 10:00 AM LOB 212
On February 15, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Finance 02/15/2017 HJ 7 P. 47
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 0148h: MA DV 314-28 02/15/2017 HJ 7 P. 47
- Amendment #2017-0148h: AA VV 02/15/2017 HJ 7 P. 47
On February 14, 2017 in the House:
- Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
On February 10, 2017 in the House:
- Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2017-0148h for 02/15/2017 (Vote 16-2; RC) HC 11 P. 22
On February 1, 2017 in the House:
- Executive Session: 02/08/2017 10:00 AM LOB 206
On January 18, 2017 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 01/25/2017 01:00 PM LOB 206
On January 12, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced 01/05/2017 and referred to State-Federal Relations and Veterans Affairs HJ 3 P. 13
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor