+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On March 12, 2015 in the House:
- Inexpedient to Legislate: MA RC 213-131; HJ 26, PG. 1230-1232
- Special Order to after lunch break (Rep Rappaport): MA VV; HJ 26, PG. 1204
On March 5, 2015 in the House:
- Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass
- Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Mar 11 (Vote 11-8; RC); HC19, PG. 435
- Executive Session: 3/3/2015 LOB 304
On February 11, 2015 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 2/19/2015 11:00 AM LOB 304
- ===CANCELLED=== Public Hearing: 2/17/2015 2:15 PM LOB 304
On February 10, 2015 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 2/17/2015 2:15 PM LOB 304
On January 8, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced and Referred to Science, Technology and Energy; HJ 12, PG. 223
+ − Vote
March 12, 2015: Inexpedient to Legislate
- Yeas: 213
- Nays: 131
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor