+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On May 18, 2023 in the Senate:
- Sen. Carson Moved Laid on Table, RC 16Y-8N, MA; 05/18/2023; SJ 15
- Pending Motion Inexpedient to Legislate; 05/18/2023; SJ 15
On May 10, 2023 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 05/18/2023; SC 22
On April 12, 2023 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 04/20/2023, Room 100, SH, 01:15 pm; SC 18
On March 24, 2023 in the Senate:
- Introduced 03/23/2023 and Referred to Judiciary; SJ 12
On March 22, 2023 in the House:
- Amendment # 2023-0755h: AA VV 03/22/2023 HJ 10 P. 19
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 2023-0755h: MA VV 03/22/2023 HJ 10 P. 19
On March 14, 2023 in the House:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2023-0755h 03/08/2023 (Vote 19-1; CC) HC 16 P. 11
On March 1, 2023 in the House:
- Executive Session: 03/08/2023 11:00 am LOB 201-203
On February 9, 2023 in the House:
- Executive Session: 02/15/2023 01:00 pm LOB 201-203
On February 1, 2023 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 02/09/2023 02:00 pm LOB 201-203
On January 10, 2023 in the House:
- Introduced (in recess of) 01/05/2023 and referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs HJ 3 P. 15
+ − Amendment
+ − Vote
May 18, 2023: Laid on Table
- Yeas: 16
- Nays: 8
- Present/NV: 24
Details:
+
−
- Jeb Bradley: Yea
- David Watters: Nay
- Sharon Carson: Yea
- Donna Soucy: Yea
- Lou D'Allesandro: Yea
- Regina Birdsell: Yea
- Shannon Chandley: Nay
- James Gray: Yea
- Keith Murphy: Yea
- Cindy Rosenwald: Nay
- Kevin Avard: Yea
- Ruth Ward: Yea
- Daniel Innis: Yea
- Debra Altschiller: Nay
- Donovan Fenton: Nay
- Timothy Lang: Yea
- Howard Pearl: Yea
- Daryl Abbas: Yea
- Suzanne Prentiss: Nay
- Rebecca Whitley: Nay
- Bill Gannon: Yea
- Rebecca Perkins Kwoka: Nay
- Denise Ricciardi: Yea
- Carrie Gendreau: Yea