+ − Actions (5)
On February 25, 2021 in the House:
- Special Order to Regular Calendar of next Session day Without Objection HJ 4 P. 46
On February 18, 2021 in the House:
- Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass
- Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 11-10; RC) HC 12 P. 31
On February 3, 2021 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 02/09/2021 02:00 pm Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/96805083773 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened.
On January 10, 2021 in the House:
- Introduced (in recess of) 01/06/2021 and referred to Judiciary HJ 2 P. 48
+ − Sponsors (15)
Type:
Primary Sponsor