+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (29)
On June 22, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by Governor Hassan 06/21/2016; Chapter 282; I. Sec. 1 eff. 6/30/2016 ; II. Rem. eff. 6/21/2016
On June 15, 2016 in the House:
- Enrolled 06/01/2016 HJ 42 P. 66
On June 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Enrolled (In recess 06/01/2016); SJ 20
On June 1, 2016 in the House:
- Conference Committee Report 2042c: Adopted, RC 189-135 06/01/2016 HJ 42 P. 41
On June 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Conference Committee Report 2042c; RC 15Y-9N, Adopted; 06/01/2016 SJ 19
On May 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Conference Committee Report Filed, #2016-2042c; 05/26/2016
On May 19, 2016 in the House:
- Conference Committee Meeting: 05/24/2016 01:00 PM LOB 306
On April 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- President Appoints: Senators Carson, Reagan, Soucy; 04/14/2016; SJ 13
- Sen. Carson Accedes to House Request for Committee of Conference, MA, VV; 04/14/2016; SJ 13
On April 6, 2016 in the House:
- Speaker Appoints: Reps. Sytek, A. Christie, Beaudoin, Gagnon 04/06/2016 HJ 31 P. 3
- House Non-Concurs with Senate Amendment 0132s and Requests CofC (Rep. A. Christie): MA VV 04/06/2016 HJ 31 P. 3
On February 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 0132s, NT, MA, VV; OT3rdg; 02/04/2016; SJ 4
- Sen. Carson Floor Amendment #2015-0132s, NT, AA, VV; SJ 4
- Committee Amendment 2015-2564s, NT, AF, VV; 02/04/2016
On January 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-2564s, NT, 02/04/2016; SC4
On January 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Special Order HB 427 to 02/04/2016, Without Objection, MA
On November 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-2564s, NT, 1/6/16; SC49
On June 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Sen. Pierce moved to Rerefer to Committee, MA, VV; SJ 17
On May 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-1974s, NT, 6/4/15; SC24
On April 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 4/15/15, Room 101, LOB, 9:15 a.m.; SC17
On March 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; SJ 10
On March 11, 2015 in the House:
- Ought to Pass with Amendment #0446, #0780: MA VV; HJ 24, PG. 890-891
- Floor Amendment #0780h (Rep Ohm): AA DV 158-127; HJ 24, PG. 890-891
- Amendment #0446h: AA VV; HJ 24, PG. 890
On March 5, 2015 in the House:
- Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
- Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-0446h for Mar 11 (Vote 11-3; RC); HC19, PG. 424-425
On February 24, 2015 in the House:
- Executive Session: 3/2/2015 12:30 PM LOB 306
On February 4, 2015 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 2/12/2015 11:00 AM LOB 306
On January 8, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; HJ 12, PG. 223
+ − Amendments (5)
+ − Votes (2)
June 1, 2016: Adopt CofC Report
- Yeas: 189
- Nays: 135
June 1, 2016: Committee of Conference Report 2042c
- Yeas: 15
- Nays: 9
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor