+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (15)
On August 1, 2023 in the House:
- Signed by Governor Sununu 07/28/2023; Chapter 152; eff: 09/26/2023 HJ 17
On June 28, 2023 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Adopted, VV, (In recess 06/15/2023); SJ 20
On June 28, 2023 in the House:
- Enrolled (in recess of) 06/15/2023 HJ 16 P. 16
On June 21, 2023 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2023-2186e: AA VV (in recess of) 06/15/2023
On June 21, 2023 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2023-2186e Adopted, VV, (In recess of 06/15/2023); SJ 20
On May 11, 2023 in the Senate:
- Ought to Pass: MA, VV; OT3rdg; 05/11/2023; SJ 14
On April 26, 2023 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 05/11/2023; Vote 5-0; CC; SC 21
On March 28, 2023 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 04/12/2023, Room 101, LOB, 09:30 am; SC 16
On March 24, 2023 in the Senate:
- Introduced 03/23/2023 and Referred to Health and Human Services; SJ 12
On March 22, 2023 in the House:
- Ought to Pass: MA VV 03/22/2023 HJ 10 P. 5
On March 14, 2023 in the House:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass 03/08/2023 (Vote 19-0; CC) HC 16 P. 4
On February 23, 2023 in the House:
- Subcommittee Work Session: 03/08/2023 10:00 am LOB 302-304
- Executive Session: 03/08/2023 01:15 pm LOB 302-304
On January 11, 2023 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 01/18/2023 01:45 pm LOB 302-304
On January 10, 2023 in the House:
- Introduced (in recess of) 01/05/2023 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs HJ 3 P. 15