+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On March 24, 2023 in the House:
- Lay HB423 on Table (Rep. Yokela): MA DV 203-178 03/23/2023 HJ 11 P. 39
On March 13, 2023 in the House:
- Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate HB423 02/15/2023 (Vote 14-6; RC) HC 16 P. 40
- Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass
On February 13, 2023 in the House:
- ==CONTINUED== Executive Session: 02/16/2023 10:30 am LOB 301-303
On February 8, 2023 in the House:
- Executive Session: 02/15/2023 10:30 am LOB 301
On January 31, 2023 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 02/08/2023 01:45 pm LOB 301-303
On January 10, 2023 in the House:
- Introduced (in recess of) 01/05/2023 and referred to Municipal and County Government HJ 3 P. 15
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor