+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (18)
On August 9, 2023 in the House:
- Signed by Governor Sununu 08/04/2023; Chapter 194; eff: 08/01/2023 HJ 17
On July 19, 2023 in the House:
- Enrolled (in recess of) 06/29/2023 HJ 17 P. 18
On July 18, 2023 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Adopted, VV, (In recess 06/29/2023); SJ 20
On July 12, 2023 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2023-2244e: AA VV (in recess of) 06/29/2023 HJ 17 P. 17
On July 11, 2023 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2023-2244e Adopted, VV, (In recess of 06/29/2023); SJ 20
On June 15, 2023 in the House:
- House Concurs with Senate Amendment 2023-1751s (Rep. Roy): MA VV 06/15/2023 HJ 16 P. 2
On May 18, 2023 in the Senate:
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 2023-1751s, MA, VV; OT3rdg; 05/18/2023; SJ 15
- Committee Amendment # 2023-1751s, AA, VV; 05/18/2023; SJ 15
On May 11, 2023 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2023-1751s, 05/18/2023; Vote 5-0; CC; SC 22
On April 5, 2023 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 04/12/2023, Room 103, SH, 09:30 am; SC 17
On March 21, 2023 in the Senate:
- Introduced 03/16/2023 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; SJ 11
On March 16, 2023 in the House:
- Amendment # 2023-0450h: AA VV 03/16/2023 HJ 9 P. 2
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 2023-0450h: MA VV 03/16/2023 HJ 9 P. 1
On March 3, 2023 in the House:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2023-0450h 02/24/2023 (Vote 20-0; CC) HC 16 P. 3
On February 7, 2023 in the House:
- Executive Session: 02/24/2023 09:00 am LOB 202-204
On February 1, 2023 in the House:
- Subcommittee Work Session: 02/06/2023 02:00 pm LOB 202-204
On January 11, 2023 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 01/20/2023 11:30 am LOB 202-204
On January 10, 2023 in the House:
- Introduced (in recess of) 01/05/2023 and referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety HJ 3 P. 15