+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (17)
On June 16, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor on 6/12/2015; Chapter 139; Effective Date 6/12/2015
On June 3, 2015 in the House:
- Enrolled
On June 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Enrolled (In recess 5/28/2015); SJ 17
On May 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Ought to Pass: MA, VV; OT3rdg; SJ 15
- Sen. Carson moved Ought to Pass; SJ 15
- Rereferred to Committee, MF, VV, SJ 15
On May 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 5/21/15; SC22
On April 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 5/12/15, Room 100, SH, 9:35 a.m.; SC19
On March 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced and Referred to Judiciary; SJ 10
On March 11, 2015 in the House:
- Ought to Pass with Amendment #0242h: MA VV; HJ 24, PG. 794
- Amendment #0242h: AA VV; HJ 24, PG. 794
On February 25, 2015 in the House:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-0242h (NT) for Mar 11 (Vote 15-0; CC); HC19, PG. 403
- Continued Executive Session: 2/19/2015 LOB 208
On February 11, 2015 in the House:
- Continued Executive Session: 2/17/2015 10:00 AM LOB 208 ==RECESSED==
On February 4, 2015 in the House:
- Executive Session: 2/4/2015 12:45 PM LOB 208 ==RECESSED==
On January 28, 2015 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 2/3/2015 1:30 PM LOB 208
On January 8, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced and Referred to Judiciary; HJ 12, PG. 222
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (15)
Type:
Primary Sponsor