+ − Actions (6)
On October 13, 2021 in the House:
- Executive Session: 10/25/2021 10:30 a.m. LOB306-308
On August 23, 2021 in the House:
- Subcommittee Work Session: 09/07/2021 10:00 am LOB 306
On March 23, 2021 in the House:
- Retained in Committee
On March 1, 2021 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 03/01/2021 10:00 am Please click the link below to join the webinar:https://zoom.us/j/97946186413 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened.
On February 17, 2021 in the House:
- Full Committee Work Session: 03/01/2021 01:30 pm Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://zoom.us/j/97946186413 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened. *The full committee work session will start at the earlier of 1:30pm or 30 minutes following the close of public hearings.
On January 10, 2021 in the House:
- Introduced (in recess of) 01/06/2021 and referred to Executive Departments and Administration HJ 2 P. 47
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor