+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On February 14, 2023 in the House:
- Inexpedient to Legislate: MA VV 02/14/2023 HJ 5
On February 9, 2023 in the House:
- Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate HB413 02/08/2023 (Vote 20-0; CC) HC 11 P. 8
On February 2, 2023 in the House:
- Executive Session: 02/08/2023 01:30 pm LOB 210-211
On January 18, 2023 in the House:
- ==CANCELLED== Executive Session: 01/25/2023 02:00 pm LOB 210-211
- Public Hearing: 01/25/2023 11:30 am LOB 210-211
On January 10, 2023 in the House:
- Introduced (in recess of) 01/05/2023 and referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs HJ 3 P. 14
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor