+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (15)
On August 9, 2023 in the House:
- Signed by Governor Sununu 08/04/2023; Chapter 193; eff: 08/04/2023 HJ 17
On July 19, 2023 in the House:
- Enrolled (in recess of) 06/29/2023 HJ 17 P. 18
On July 18, 2023 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Adopted, VV, (In recess 06/29/2023); SJ 20
On June 15, 2023 in the House:
- House Concurs with Senate Amendment 2023-1745s (Rep. Layon): MA VV 06/15/2023 HJ 16 P. 2
On May 18, 2023 in the Senate:
- Committee Amendment # 2023-1745s, AA, VV; 05/18/2023; SJ 15
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 2023-1745s, MA, VV; OT3rdg; 05/18/2023; SJ 15
On May 10, 2023 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2023-1745s, 05/18/2023; Vote 5-0; CC; SC 22
On March 28, 2023 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 04/12/2023, Room 101, LOB, 10:00 am; SC 16
On March 24, 2023 in the Senate:
- Introduced 03/23/2023 and Referred to Health and Human Services; SJ 12
On March 22, 2023 in the House:
- Amendment # 2023-0577h: AA VV 03/22/2023 HJ 10 P. 18
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 2023-0577h: MA VV 03/22/2023 HJ 10 P. 18
On March 16, 2023 in the House:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2023-0577h 03/13/2023 (Vote 20-0; CC) HC 16 P. 11
On March 1, 2023 in the House:
- Executive Session: 03/08/2023 11:00 am LOB 201-203
On February 8, 2023 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 02/16/2023 01:00 pm LOB 201-203
On January 10, 2023 in the House:
- Introduced (in recess of) 01/05/2023 and referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs HJ 3 P. 14