+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On October 31, 2017 in the House:
- Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 21-0; CC)
On October 18, 2017 in the House:
- ==RESCHEDULED== Executive Session: 10/25/2017 02:00 PM LOB 304
- Retained Bill Full Committee Work Session: 10/25/2017 01:00 PM LOB 304
On October 12, 2017 in the House:
- ==CANCELLED== Executive Session: 10/25/2017 01:00 PM LOB 304
On September 28, 2017 in the House:
- Retained Bill Subcommittee Work Session: 10/10/2017 03:00 PM LOB 304
On September 13, 2017 in the House:
- Retained Bill Subcommittee Work Session: 09/28/2017 11:30 AM LOB 304
On July 31, 2017 in the House:
- Retained Bill Full Committee Work Session: 09/06/2017 01:30 PM LOB 304
On February 21, 2017 in the House:
- Retained in Committee
On February 15, 2017 in the House:
- Executive Session: 02/21/2017 02:00 PM LOB 304
- Full Committee Work Session: 02/21/2017 10:00 AM LOB 304
On January 25, 2017 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 02/08/2017 11:00 AM LOB 304
On January 11, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced 01/05/2017 and referred to Science, Technology and Energy HJ 3 P. 11
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor