+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (13)
On May 13, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by Governor Sununu 05/10/2019; Chapter 12; Eff: 07/09/2019
On April 25, 2019 in the House:
- Enrolled 04/11/2019 HJ 13 P. 127
On April 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Enrolled (In recess 04/25/2019); SJ 15
On April 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Ought to Pass: MA, VV; OT3rdg; 04/11/2019; SJ 12
On April 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 04/11/2019; Vote 5-0; CC SC 17
On March 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 04/04/2019, Room 101, LOB, 09:45 am; SC 16
On March 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced 03/14/2019 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; SJ 9
On February 27, 2019 in the House:
- Ought to Pass: MA VV 02/27/2019 HJ 6 P. 4
On February 13, 2019 in the House:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 02/27/2019 (Vote 18-0; CC) HC 13 P. 3
On January 29, 2019 in the House:
- Executive Session: 02/06/2019 02:00 pm LOB 302
- Subcommittee Work Session: 02/06/2019 09:30 am LOB 104
On January 23, 2019 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 01/30/2019 10:00 am LOB 302
On January 7, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs HJ 3 P. 13
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor