+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (20)
On July 22, 2024 in the House:
- Signed by Governor Sununu 07/03/2024; Chapter 98; eff. 01/01/2025
On June 19, 2024 in the House:
- Enrolled (in recess of) 06/13/2024 HJ 16 P. 43
On June 19, 2024 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Adopted, VV, (In recess 06/13/2024); SJ 18
On May 9, 2024 in the House:
- House Concurs with Senate Amendment 2024-1608s (Rep. Renzullo): MA VV 05/09/2024 HJ 13 P. 2
On April 26, 2024 in the Senate:
- Committee Amendment # 2024-1608s, AA, VV; 05/02/2024; SJ 11
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 2024-1608s, MA, VV; OT3rdg; 05/02/2024; SJ 11
On April 25, 2024 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2024-1608s, 05/02/2024; Vote 5-0; CC; SC 17
On March 26, 2024 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 04/02/2024, Room 100, SH, 10:40 am; SC 13
On February 22, 2024 in the Senate:
- Introduced 02/21/2024 and Referred to Commerce; SJ 6
On January 3, 2024 in the House:
- Amendment # 2023-2296h: AA VV 01/03/2024 HJ 1 P. 65
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 2023-2296h: MA VV 01/03/2024 HJ 1 P. 65
On November 13, 2023 in the House:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2023-2296h (NT) 11/01/2023 (Vote 20-0; CC) HC 49 P. 20
On October 11, 2023 in the House:
- Executive Session: 11/01/2023 10:00 am LOB 306-308 HC 41
On September 28, 2023 in the House:
- Subcommittee Work Session: 10/18/2023 10:00 am LOB 306-308 HC 39
On March 13, 2023 in the House:
- Retained in Committee
On February 16, 2023 in the House:
- Executive Session: 03/08/2023 11:00 am LOB 305-307
- ==CANCELLED== Full Committee Work Session: 03/01/2023 02:30 pm LOB 305-307
On January 30, 2023 in the House:
- Executive Session: 02/08/2023 10:30 am LOB 305-307
On January 25, 2023 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 02/01/2023 01:45 pm LOB 305-307
On January 10, 2023 in the House:
- Introduced (in recess of) 01/05/2023 and referred to Resources, Recreation and Development HJ 3 P. 14
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor