+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On January 8, 2014 in the House:
- Inexpedient to Legislate MA VV
On November 25, 2013 in the House:
- Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Jan 8 (Vote 18-0; CC); HC 1
On October 10, 2013 in the House:
- ==RESCHEDULED==Retained Bill-Executive Session: 11/7/2013 1:00 PM -Room Change-LOB 305
- ==CANCELLED==Retained Bill-Executive Session: 11/6/2013 10:15 AM LOB 305
On February 19, 2013 in the House:
- Retained in Committee
On February 6, 2013 in the House:
- Executive Session: 2/19/2013 10:15 AM LOB 305
On January 29, 2013 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 2/5/2013 10:45 AM LOB 305
On January 3, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced 1/3/2013 and Referred to Resources, Recreation and Development; HJ 12, PG.194