+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On March 20, 2019 in the House:
- Inexpedient to Legislate: MA RC 203-141 03/20/2019 HJ 11 P. 48
On March 14, 2019 in the House:
- Special Order to 03/19/2019 (Rep. Conley): MA VV 03/14/2019 HJ 9 P. 43
On March 7, 2019 in the House:
- Special Order to 03/14/2019 Without Objection HJ 8 P. 60
On February 15, 2019 in the House:
- Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass
- Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 03/07/2019 (Vote 13-7; RC) HC 14 P. 20
On January 29, 2019 in the House:
- Executive Session: 02/05/2019 01:00 pm LOB 203
On January 23, 2019 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 01/29/2019 11:00 am LOB 203
On January 7, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Transportation HJ 3 P. 12
+ − Vote
March 20, 2019: ITL
- Yeas: 203
- Nays: 141
- Present/NV: 11
- Absent: 45