+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On May 11, 2023 in the Senate:
- Sen. Gray Moved Laid on Table, MA, VV; 05/11/2023; SJ 14
- Pending Motion Rerefer to Committee; 05/11/2023; SJ 14
On April 18, 2023 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 05/11/2023; SC 21
On March 29, 2023 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 04/04/2023, Room 103, LOB, 09:45 am; SC 16
On March 7, 2023 in the Senate:
- Introduced 02/22/2023 and Referred to Election Law and Municipal Affairs; SJ 9
On February 22, 2023 in the House:
- Amendment # 2023-0452h: AA VV 02/22/2023 HJ 6 P. 13
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 2023-0452h: MA VV 02/22/2023 HJ 6 P. 13
On February 15, 2023 in the House:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2023-0452h 02/10/2023 (Vote 16-0; CC) HC 12 P. 8
On February 1, 2023 in the House:
- Executive Session: 02/10/2023 10:00 am LOB 206-208
On January 26, 2023 in the House:
- Executive Session: 02/03/2023 01:00 pm LOB 206-208
On January 19, 2023 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 02/03/2023 09:00 am LOB 206-208
On January 9, 2023 in the House:
- Introduced (in recess of) 01/05/2023 and referred to State-Federal Relations and Veterans Affairs HJ 3 P. 14
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor