+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On November 12, 2015 in the House:
- Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Jan 6 (Vote 19-0; CC); HC 67, PG. 11
On September 23, 2015 in the House:
- ==RESCHEDULED==Executive Session: 10/14/2015 10:00 AM LOB 202
On September 16, 2015 in the House:
- ==CANCELED==Executive Session: 10/29/2015 10:00 AM LOB 202
On August 25, 2015 in the House:
- Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 9/10/2015 10:00 AM LOB 202
On May 27, 2015 in the House:
- Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 6/2/2015 1:30 PM LOB 202
On March 4, 2015 in the House:
- Retained in Committee
On February 25, 2015 in the House:
- Executive Session: 3/3/2015 10:00 AM LOB 202
On February 9, 2015 in the House:
- Continued Public Hearing: 2/17/2015 10:30 AM LOB 202
On January 29, 2015 in the House:
- ==RESCHEDULED== Public Hearing: 2/9/2015 2:30 PM LOB 202==RECESSED=
On January 21, 2015 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 2/3/2015 2:30 PM LOB 202
On January 8, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced and Referred to Ways and Means; HJ 12, PG. 221
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor