+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (15)
On February 19, 2020 in the House:
- Inexpedient to Legislate: MA VV 02/19/2020 HJ 4 P. 14
On February 5, 2020 in the House:
- Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 02/19/2020 (Vote 20-0; CC) HC 7 P. 9
On January 15, 2020 in the House:
- Division III Work Session: 01/21/2020 02:00 pm LOB 210-211
On January 10, 2020 in the House:
- Executive Session: 02/05/2020 10:00 am LOB 210-211
On January 8, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Finance 01/08/2020 HJ 1 P. 51
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 2019-2789h (NT): MA VV 01/08/2020 HJ 1 P. 51
- Amendment # 2019-2789h (NT): AA VV 01/08/2020 HJ 1 P. 51
On October 24, 2019 in the House:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-2789h (NT) (Vote 11-1; CC) HC 50
On October 2, 2019 in the House:
- Executive Session: 10/22/2019 10:30 am LOB 303
- Full Committee Work Session: 10/22/2019 10:00 am LOB 303
On September 18, 2019 in the House:
- Full Committee Work Session: 09/26/2019 10:00 am LOB 303
On February 5, 2019 in the House:
- Retained in Committee
On January 16, 2019 in the House:
- Executive Session: 01/30/2019 01:00 pm LOB 303
- Public Hearing: 01/23/2019 01:30 pm LOB 303
On January 7, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Legislative Administration HJ 3 P. 12
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor