+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On January 8, 2020 in the Senate:
- Refer to Interim Study, MA, VV; 01/08/2020; SJ 1
On November 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Referred to Interim Study, 01/08/2020; SC 47
On May 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Committee, MA, VV; 05/02/2019; SJ 15
On April 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 05/02/2019; Vote 5-0; CC; SC 20
On April 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 04/23/2019, Room 103, LOB, 09:00 am; SC 19
On March 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced 03/14/2019 and Referred to Education and Workforce Development; SJ 9
On March 7, 2019 in the House:
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 2019-0285h (NT): MA DV 202-161 03/07/2019 HJ 8 P. 18
- Amendment # 2019-0285h (NT): AA VV 03/07/2019 HJ 8 P. 18
On February 12, 2019 in the House:
- Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
- Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-0285h (NT) for 03/07/2019 (Vote 12-7; RC) HC 14 P. 8
On January 30, 2019 in the House:
- Executive Session: 02/05/2019 10:00 am LOB 207
On January 16, 2019 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 01/23/2019 10:15 am LOB 207
On January 7, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Education HJ 3 P. 12