+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On January 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Inexpedient to Legislate, MA, VV === BILL KILLED ===; 01/21/2016; SJ 3
On January 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 01/21/2016; Vote 5-0; CC; SC2
On May 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Committee, MA, VV, SJ 15
On May 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 5/21/15; SC22
On March 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 3/31/15, Room 101, LOB, 1:40 p.m.; SC15
On March 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced and Referred to Health and Human Services; SJ 10
On March 11, 2015 in the House:
- Ought to Pass with Amendment #0234h: MA RC 214-157; HJ 24, PG. 830-832
- Floor Amendment #2015-0234h (Rep Oligny): AA RC 213-157; HJ 24, PG. 827-830
- Inexpedient to Legislate: MF RC 154-217; HJ 24, PG. 825-827
On February 5, 2015 in the House:
- Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass
- Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Mar 11 (Vote 9-8; RC); HC19, PG. 412
On February 4, 2015 in the House:
- Executive Session: 2/4/2015 12:00 PM LOB 206
On January 26, 2015 in the House:
- ==RESCHEDULED==Public Hearing: 1/28/2015 1:15 PM LOB 206
On January 21, 2015 in the House:
- ==POSTPONED==Public Hearing: 1/27/2015 1:15 PM LOB 206
On January 8, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced and Referred to Children and Family Law; HJ 12, PG. 219
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor