+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On January 3, 2024 in the Senate:
- Refer to Interim Study, MA, VV; 01/03/2024; SJ 1
On December 18, 2023 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Referred to Interim Study, 01/03/2024; Vote 5-0; CC; SC 49
On May 18, 2023 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Committee, MA, VV; 05/18/2023; SJ 15
On April 17, 2023 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 04/27/2023, Room 103, SH, 01:30 pm; SC 19
On April 11, 2023 in the Senate:
- Introduced 03/30/2023 and Referred to Judiciary; SJ 13
On April 6, 2023 in the House:
- Ought to Pass: MA VV 04/06/2023 HJ 12 P. 2
On March 21, 2023 in the House:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass 03/21/2023 (Vote 25-0; CC)
On March 16, 2023 in the House:
- Executive Session: 03/20/2023 01:00 pm LOB 210-211
On February 23, 2023 in the House:
- Division Work Session: 03/03/2023 11:30 am LOB 212
On February 14, 2023 in the House:
- Amendment # 2023-0347h: AA VV 02/14/2023 HJ 5 P. 11
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 2023-0347h: MA VV 02/14/2023 HJ 5 P. 11
- Referred to Finance 02/14/2023 HJ 5
On February 8, 2023 in the House:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2023-0347h (NT) 02/08/2023 (Vote 20-0; CC) HC 11 P. 10
On February 1, 2023 in the House:
- Executive Session: 02/08/2023 11:00 am LOB 206-208
On January 25, 2023 in the House:
- Executive Session: 02/01/2023 09:00 am LOB 206-208
On January 18, 2023 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 01/25/2023 02:30 pm LOB 206-208
On January 9, 2023 in the House:
- Introduced (in recess of) 01/05/2023 and referred to Judiciary HJ 3 P. 13