+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (14)
On May 20, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by Governor 05/16/2013; Effective 07/15/2013; Chapter 0031
On April 24, 2013 in the House:
- Enrolled; HJ38, PG.1257
On April 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
- Ought to Pass: MA, VV; OT3rdg;
On April 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 4/18/13; Vote 5-0; CC; SC16
On March 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 3/13/13, Room 100, SH, 10:20 a.m.; SC11
On February 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced 2/14/2013 and Referred to Executive Dept. & Admin.; SJ 6
On February 20, 2013 in the House:
- Ought to Pass with Amendment #0148h: MA VV; HJ 21, PG.462
- Amendment #0148h: AA VV; HJ 21, PG.462
On February 13, 2013 in the House:
- Proposed Committee Amendment #2013-0148h; HC 15, PG.294-295
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #0148h for Feb 20 (Vote 16-0; CC); HC 15, PG.264
On February 6, 2013 in the House:
- Executive Session: 2/12/2013 1:30 PM LOB 306
On January 23, 2013 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 1/31/2013 2:00 PM LOB 306
On January 3, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced 1/3/2013 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; HJ 12, PG.193
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor