+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On February 14, 2023 in the House:
- Inexpedient to Legislate: MA DV 191-179 02/14/2023 HJ 5 P. 37
On February 8, 2023 in the House:
- Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate HB374-FN 02/07/2023 (Vote 11-9; RC) HC 11 P. 16
- Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass
On February 3, 2023 in the House:
- Executive Session: 02/07/2023 02:00 pm LOB 201-203
On January 25, 2023 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 01/24/2023 09:00 am LOB 201-203
- Executive Session: 01/31/2023 01:00 pm LOB 201-203
On January 9, 2023 in the House:
- Introduced (in recess of) 01/05/2023 and referred to Transportation HJ 3 P. 13