+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (15)
On June 6, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by Governor 06/04/2013; Effective 08/03/2013; Chapter 0040
On May 8, 2013 in the House:
- Enrolled; HJ41, PG.1424
On May 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
- Ought to Pass: MA, VV; OT3rdg;
On April 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass 5/2/13; Vote 5-0; CC; SC18
On March 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 4/3/13, Room 101, LOB, 10:15 a.m.; SC14
On March 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced and Referred to Energy & Natural Resources
On March 13, 2013 in the House:
- Ought to Pass with Amendment #0707h: MA VV; HJ 26, PG.768-769
- Amendment #0707h: AA VV; HJ 26, PG.768-769
On March 6, 2013 in the House:
- Proposed Committee Amendment #2013-0707h; HC 22, PG.545-546
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #0707h for Mar 13 (Vote 19-0; CC); HC 22, PG.512
On February 21, 2013 in the House:
- Executive Session: 3/5/2013 1:00 PM LOB 304
On February 20, 2013 in the House:
- Full Committee Work Session: 3/5/2013 10:00 AM LOB 304
On February 6, 2013 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 2/14/2013 3:00 PM LOB 304
On January 3, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced 1/3/2013 and Referred to Science, Technology and Energy; HJ 12, PG.193