+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On January 3, 2024 in the House:
- Inexpedient to Legislate: MA VV 01/03/2024 HJ 1 P. 36
On November 17, 2023 in the House:
- Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate HB373-FN 11/08/2023 (Vote 19-0; CC) HC 49 P. 5
On November 8, 2023 in the House:
- ==CANCELLED== Executive Session: 11/15/2023 11:00 am LOB 302-304 HC 42
On October 17, 2023 in the House:
- ==RECESSED== Executive Session: 11/08/2023 01:30 pm LOB 302-304 HC 42
On September 6, 2023 in the House:
- ==RESCHEDULED== Subcommittee Work Session: 09/20/2023 01:15 pm LOB 302-304 HC 36
On August 30, 2023 in the House:
- ==CANCELLED== Subcommittee Work Session: 09/06/2023 01:15 pm LOB 302-304
On February 15, 2023 in the House:
- Retained in Committee
On February 9, 2023 in the House:
- Executive Session: 02/15/2023 01:15 pm LOB 302-304
On February 1, 2023 in the House:
- Subcommittee Work Session: 02/08/2023 10:45 am LOB 302-304
On January 19, 2023 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 01/26/2023 02:30 pm LOB 302-304
On January 17, 2023 in the House:
- Introduced (in recess of) 01/05/2023 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs HJ 3 P. 13