+ − Actions (6)
On April 7, 2021 in the House:
- Removed from Consent (Rep. Abramson) 04/07/2021 HJ 5 P. 2
On March 29, 2021 in the House:
- Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 20-0; CC) HC 18 P. 9
On March 8, 2021 in the House:
- Executive Session: 03/08/2021 01:00 pm Please click the link below to join the webinar:https://zoom.us/j/91394352757
On March 4, 2021 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 03/04/2021 02:30 pm Please click the link below to join the webinar:https://zoom.us/j/91092569734Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened.
On March 3, 2021 in the House:
- ==CONTINUED== Executive Session: 03/10/2021 10:20 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://zoom.us/j/95087806399 (if necessary)
On January 9, 2021 in the House:
- Introduced (in recess of) 01/06/2021 and referred to Election Law HJ 2 P. 45