+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On January 4, 2024 in the House:
- Ought to Pass: MF RC 186-188 01/04/2024 HJ 2 P. 6
- Inexpedient to Legislate: MA DV 190-185 01/04/2024 HJ 2 P. 8
On November 16, 2023 in the House:
- Committee Report: Without Recommendation 11/13/2023 (Vote 10-10; RC) HC 49 P. 39
On November 8, 2023 in the House:
- Executive Session: 11/13/2023 10:45 am LOB 201-203 HC 45
On November 1, 2023 in the House:
- Subcommittee Work Session: 11/08/2023 10:00 am LOB 205-207 HC 44
On October 17, 2023 in the House:
- Subcommittee Work Session: 10/27/2023 11:00 am LOB 201-203 HC 42
On May 18, 2023 in the House:
- Full Committee Work Session: 05/24/2023 10:00 am LOB 205-207
On March 15, 2023 in the House:
- Retained in Committee
On March 10, 2023 in the House:
- Executive Session: 03/13/2023 09:30 am LOB 206-208
On March 8, 2023 in the House:
- ==CANCELLED== Executive Session: 03/15/2023 09:30 am LOB 301-303
On February 8, 2023 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 03/07/2023 01:00 pm SH Reps Hall
On January 9, 2023 in the House:
- Introduced (in recess of) 01/05/2023 and referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs HJ 3 P. 13
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor