+ − Actions (14)
On June 9, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by Governor Sununu 06/04/2021; Chapter 63; Eff: 01/01/2022
On May 26, 2021 in the House:
- Enrolled (in recess of) 04/09/2021 HJ 7 P. 104
On May 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Adopted, VV, (In recess 05/20/2021); SJ 17
On April 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Ought to Pass: RC 24Y-0N, MA; OT3rdg; 04/29/2021; SJ 13
On April 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 04/29/2021; Vote 5-0; CC; SC 21
On April 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Remote Hearing: 04/14/2021, 01:15 pm; Links to join the hearing can be found in the Senate Calendar; SC 19
- Introduced 04/01/2021 and Referred to Judiciary; SJ 11
On April 7, 2021 in the House:
- Reconsider (Rep. Osborne): MF VV 04/07/2021 HJ 5 P. 50
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 2021-0513h: MA VV 04/07/2021 HJ 5 P. 38
- Amendment # 2021-0513h: AA VV 04/07/2021 HJ 5 P. 38
On March 9, 2021 in the House:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2021-0513h (Vote 21-0; CC) HC 18 P. 17
On March 2, 2021 in the House:
- Executive Session: 03/02/2021 09:00 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/95501229688
On January 27, 2021 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 02/02/2021 10:45 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/91233802944 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened.
On January 9, 2021 in the House:
- Introduced (in recess of) 01/06/2021 and referred to Judiciary HJ 2 P. 45
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor