+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On March 16, 2023 in the House:
- Inexpedient to Legislate: MA VV 03/16/2023 HJ 9 P. 8
On March 13, 2023 in the House:
- Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate HB359 03/08/2023 (Vote 20-0; CC) HC 15 P. 6
On February 21, 2023 in the House:
- Executive Session: 03/08/2023 01:30 pm LOB 306-308
On February 15, 2023 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 02/16/2023 02:30 pm LOB 306-308
On January 9, 2023 in the House:
- Introduced (in recess of) 01/05/2023 and referred to Executive Departments and Administration HJ 3 P. 12