+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (14)
On June 11, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by Governor Sununu 06/05/2019; Chapter 55; Eff: 08/04/2019
On May 16, 2019 in the House:
- Enrolled 05/08/2019 HJ 15 P. 101
On May 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Enrolled (In recess 05/15/2019); SJ 17
On May 2, 2019 in the House:
- House Concurs with Senate Amendment 2019-1449s (Rep. Luneau): MA VV 05/02/2019 HJ 14 P. 2
On April 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 2019-1449s, MA, VV; OT3rdg; 04/18/2019; SJ 13
- Committee Amendment # 2019-1449s, AA, VV; 04/18/2019; SJ 13
On April 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-1449s, 04/18/2019; Vote 5-0; CC; SC 18
On April 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 04/09/2019, Room 103, LOB, 10:30 am; SC 17
On March 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced 03/07/2019 and Referred to Education and Workforce Development; SJ 8
On February 14, 2019 in the House:
- Ought to Pass: MA VV 02/14/2019 HJ 5 P. 9
On January 30, 2019 in the House:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 02/14/2019 (Vote 20-0; CC) HC 11 P. 4
On January 23, 2019 in the House:
- Executive Session: 01/29/2019 10:00 am LOB 207
On January 8, 2019 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 01/17/2019 01:30 pm LOB 207
On December 31, 2018 in the House:
- Introduced 01/02/2019 and referred to Education HJ 2 P. 46
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor