+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (15)
On June 27, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by Governor Sununu 06/25/2019; Chapter 128; Eff: 08/24/2019
On May 31, 2019 in the House:
- Enrolled 05/23/2019 HJ 16 P. 51
On May 31, 2019 in the Senate:
- Enrolled (In recess 05/30/2019); SJ 19
On May 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Ought to Pass: MA, VV; OT3rdg; 05/15/2019; SJ 16
- Sen. Gray Floor Amendment # 2019-1899s, AF, VV; 05/15/2019; SJ 16
On May 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 05/15/2019; SC 22
On April 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 04/24/2019, Room 102, LOB, 10:00 am; SC 19
On March 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced 03/14/2019 and Referred to Election Law and Municipal Affairs; SJ 9
On February 27, 2019 in the House:
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 2019-0385h: MA VV 02/27/2019 HJ 6 P. 8
- Amendment # 2019-0385h: AA VV 02/27/2019 HJ 6 P. 8
On February 20, 2019 in the House:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-0385h for 02/27/2019 (Vote 20-0; CC) HC 13 P. 6
On February 6, 2019 in the House:
- ==CONTINUED== Executive Session: 02/12/2019 11:00 am LOB 308
On January 29, 2019 in the House:
- ==RECESSED== Executive Session: 02/06/2019 10:00 am LOB 308
On January 3, 2019 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 01/10/2019 10:00 am LOB 305-307
On December 31, 2018 in the House:
- Introduced 01/02/2019 and referred to Election Law HJ 2 P. 46
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor