+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (14)
On July 10, 2023 in the House:
- Vetoed by Governor Sununu 06/29/2023 HJ 17
On June 20, 2023 in the House:
- Enrolled (in recess of) 06/15/2023 HJ 16 P. 14
On June 20, 2023 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Adopted, VV, (In recess 06/15/2023); SJ 20
On May 11, 2023 in the Senate:
- Ought to Pass: MA, VV; OT3rdg; 05/11/2023; SJ 14
On April 12, 2023 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 05/11/2023; Vote 5-0; CC; SC 21
On March 28, 2023 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 04/05/2023, Room 101, LOB, 09:00 am; SC 16
On March 24, 2023 in the Senate:
- Introduced 03/23/2023 and Referred to Health and Human Services; SJ 12
On March 23, 2023 in the House:
- Amendment # 2023-0842h: AA VV 03/22/2023 HJ 10 P. 113
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 2023-0842h: MA DV 193-180 03/22/2023 HJ 10 P. 114
On March 14, 2023 in the House:
- Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2023-0842h 03/08/2023 (Vote 11-9; RC) HC 16 P. 33
- Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
On March 1, 2023 in the House:
- Executive Session: 03/08/2023 11:00 am LOB 201-203
On February 8, 2023 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 02/16/2023 02:00 pm LOB 201-203
On January 9, 2023 in the House:
- Introduced (in recess of) 01/05/2023 and referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs HJ 3 P. 12