+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On February 14, 2023 in the House:
- Inexpedient to Legislate: MA DV 188-184 02/14/2023 HJ 5 P. 41
On January 27, 2023 in the House:
- Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate 01/24/2023 (Vote 8-7; RC) HC 11 P. 17
- Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass
On January 18, 2023 in the House:
- Executive Session: 01/24/2023 10:30 am LOB 206-208
On January 5, 2023 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 01/10/2023 02:30 pm LOB 206-208
On December 23, 2022 in the House:
- Introduced 01/04/2023 and referred to Children and Family Law
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor