+ − Actions (6)
On March 9, 2021 in the House:
- Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass
- Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 11-7; RC) HC 18 P. 64
On March 3, 2021 in the House:
- Executive Session: 03/03/2021 01:30 pm Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/98917516497 (if necessary)
On March 2, 2021 in the House:
- Executive Session: 03/02/2021 09:00 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/95215897452
On January 27, 2021 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 02/03/2021 11:00 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/91813981191 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened.
On January 9, 2021 in the House:
- Introduced (in recess of) 01/06/2021 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs HJ 2 P. 44
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor