+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (18)
On June 16, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor on 6/12/2015; Chapter 137; Effective Date 6/12/2015
On June 3, 2015 in the House:
- Enrolled
On June 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Enrolled (In recess 5/28/2015); SJ 17
On May 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Ought to Pass: MA, VV; OT3rdg; SJ 15
On May 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 5/21/15; SC22
On April 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 4/15/15, Room 100, SH, 2:00 p.m.; SC17
On March 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced and Referred to Capital Budget; SJ 11
On March 25, 2015 in the House:
- Ought to Pass: MA VV; HJ 28, PG. 1290
On March 19, 2015 in the House:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass for Mar 25 (Vote 21-0; CC); HC 23, PG. 632
On March 12, 2015 in the House:
- Executive Session: 3/18/2015 9:00 AM LOB 210-211
On March 3, 2015 in the House:
- Division I Work Session: 3/16/2015 11:30 AM LOB 212
On February 18, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Finance
- Ought to Pass with Amendment #0304h: MA VV; HJ 20, PG. 505
- Amendment #0304h: AA VV; HJ 20, PG. 505
On February 12, 2015 in the House:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-0304h for Feb 18 (Vote 17-0; CC); HC13, PG. 242
On January 20, 2015 in the House:
- Executive Session: 2/10/2015 10:15 AM LOB 201
- Public Hearing: 2/5/2015 11:15 AM LOB 201
On January 8, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced and Referred to Public Works and Highways; HJ 12, PG. 217
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor