+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On March 11, 2015 in the House:
- Inexpedient to Legislate: MA VV; HJ 24, PG. 888
On March 5, 2015 in the House:
- Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Mar 11 (Vote 12-4; RC); HC19, PG. 424
On February 24, 2015 in the House:
- Executive Session: 3/2/2015 12:30 PM LOB 306
On February 11, 2015 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 2/19/2015 11:00 AM LOB 306
On February 4, 2015 in the House:
- Vacated from Commerce and Consumer Affairs and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; HJ 14, PG. 273
On January 21, 2015 in the House:
- ===CANCELLED=== Public Hearing: 2/5/2015 1:15 PM LOB 302
On January 20, 2015 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 2/5/2015 1:15 PM LOB 302
On January 8, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced and Referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs; HJ 12, PG. 217
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor