+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On June 16, 2020 in the Senate:
- Vacated from Committee and Laid on Table, MA, VV; 06/16/2020 SJ 8
On March 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- ==CANCELLED== Hearing: 03/24/2020, Room 103, LOB, 01:00 pm; SC 11
- Introduced 03/11/2020 and Referred to Transportation; SJ 7
On January 8, 2020 in the House:
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 2019-2777h (NT): MA VV 01/08/2020 HJ 1 P. 54
- Amendment # 2019-2777h (NT): AA VV 01/08/2020 HJ 1 P. 54
On October 25, 2019 in the House:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-2777h (NT) (Vote 17-0; CC) HC 50 P. 14
On October 2, 2019 in the House:
- Executive Session: 10/22/2019 10:00 am LOB 203
On September 18, 2019 in the House:
- Full Committee Work Session: 10/08/2019 10:00 am LOB 203
- Full Committee Work Session: 10/01/2019 10:00 am LOB 203
On February 6, 2019 in the House:
- Retained in Committee
On January 23, 2019 in the House:
- Executive Session: 01/29/2019 02:00 pm LOB 203
On January 9, 2019 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 01/15/2019 02:00 pm LOB 203
On December 31, 2018 in the House:
- Introduced 01/02/2019 and referred to Transportation HJ 2 P. 45
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor