+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On February 18, 2015 in the House:
- Inexpedient to Legislate: MA VV; HJ 20, PG. 506
On February 13, 2015 in the House:
- Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Feb 18 (Vote 19-0; CC); HC13, PG. 243
- Executive Session: 2/6/2015 LOB 202
On January 26, 2015 in the House:
- ==RESCHEDULED== Public Hearing: 1/28/2015 1:30 PM LOB 202
On January 21, 2015 in the House:
- ==POSTPONED== Public Hearing: 1/27/2015 1:30 PM LOB 202
On January 8, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced and Referred to Ways and Means; HJ 12, PG. 217
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor