+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (28)
On August 10, 2023 in the House:
- Signed by Governor Sununu 08/08/2023; Chapter 234; eff: 01/01/2024 HJ 17
On July 28, 2023 in the House:
- Enrolled (in recess of) 06/29/2023 HJ 17 P. 18
On July 27, 2023 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Adopted, VV, (In recess 06/29/2023); SJ 20
On July 18, 2023 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2023-2249e: AA VV (in recess of) 06/29/2023 HJ 17 P. 17
On July 17, 2023 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2023-2249e Adopted, VV, (In recess of 06/29/2023); SJ 20
On June 29, 2023 in the Senate:
- Conference Committee Report # 2023-2233c, Adopted, VV; 06/29/2023; SJ 20
On June 29, 2023 in the House:
- Conference Committee Report 2023-2233c: Adopted, DV 271-98 06/29/2023 HJ 17 P. 9
On June 22, 2023 in the Senate:
- Conference Committee Report Filed, # 2023-2233c; 06/29/2023
On June 22, 2023 in the House:
- Conference Committee Meeting: 06/22/2023 10:00 am LOB 201-203
On June 15, 2023 in the Senate:
- Sen. Carson Accedes to House Request for Committee of Conference, MA, VV; 06/15/2023; SJ 19
- President Appoints: Senators Abbas, Innis, Whitley; 06/15/2023; SJ 19
On June 15, 2023 in the House:
- House Non-Concurs with Senate Amendment 2023-2170s and Requests CofC (Rep. Roy): MA DV 199-175 06/15/2023 HJ 16 P. 4
- Speaker Appoints: Reps. Roy, Rhodes, Harriott-Gathright, Wheeler 06/15/2023 HJ 16 P. 4
On June 8, 2023 in the Senate:
- Inexpedient to Legislate, MF, VV; 06/08/2023; SJ 18
- Sen. Carson Moved Ought to Pass; 06/08/2023; SJ 18
- Sen. Chandley Floor Amendment # 2023-2170s, RC 20Y-4N, AA; 06/08/2023; SJ 18
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 2023-2170s, MA, VV; OT3rdg; 06/08/2023; SJ 18
On June 1, 2023 in the Senate:
- Special Order to 06/08/2023, Without Objection, MA; 06/01/2023 SJ 16
- Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 06/08/2023; SC 25
On May 30, 2023 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 06/01/2023; SC 24A
On April 12, 2023 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 04/18/2023, Room 100, SH, 01:30 pm; SC 18
On March 24, 2023 in the Senate:
- Introduced 03/23/2023 and Referred to Judiciary; SJ 12
On March 22, 2023 in the House:
- Amendment # 2023-0370h: AA VV 03/22/2023 HJ 10 P. 8
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 2023-00370h: MA VV 03/22/2023 HJ 10 P. 8
On March 15, 2023 in the House:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2023-0370h (NT) 02/10/2023 (Vote 20-0; CC) HC 16 P. 6
On February 1, 2023 in the House:
- Executive Session: 02/10/2023 11:00 am LOB 202-204
On January 18, 2023 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 02/01/2023 01:15 pm LOB 202-204
On January 9, 2023 in the House:
- Introduced (in recess of) 01/05/2023 and referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety HJ 3 P. 10
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Vote
June 8, 2023: Floor Amendment
- Yeas: 20
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 24
Details:
+
−
- Jeb Bradley: Yea
- David Watters: Yea
- Sharon Carson: Yea
- Donna Soucy: Yea
- Lou D'Allesandro: Yea
- Regina Birdsell: Yea
- Shannon Chandley: Yea
- James Gray: Yea
- Keith Murphy: Nay
- Cindy Rosenwald: Yea
- Kevin Avard: Nay
- Ruth Ward: Yea
- Daniel Innis: Yea
- Debra Altschiller: Yea
- Donovan Fenton: Yea
- Timothy Lang: Yea
- Howard Pearl: Yea
- Daryl Abbas: Yea
- Suzanne Prentiss: Yea
- Rebecca Whitley: Yea
- Bill Gannon: Nay
- Rebecca Perkins Kwoka: Yea
- Denise Ricciardi: Yea
- Carrie Gendreau: Nay