+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (15)
On June 3, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor on 6/2/2015; Chapter 66; Effective Date 6/2/2015
On May 19, 2015 in the House:
- Enrolled (in recess of 5/6/2015); HJ 41, PG. 1781
On May 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Enrolled (In recess 5/14/2015); SJ 15
On May 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Ought to Pass: MA, VV; OT3rdg; SJ 13
On April 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 5/7/15; SC20
On March 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 3/25/15, Room 102, LOB, 10:00 a.m.; SC14
On March 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced and Referred to Public and Municipal Affairs; SJ 8
On March 4, 2015 in the House:
- Ought to Pass with Amendment #0359h: MA VV; HJ 22, PG. 560
- Amendment #0359h: AA VV; HJ 22, PG. 560
On February 20, 2015 in the House:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-0359h for Mar 4 (Vote 15-1; CC); HC18, PG. 345
On February 11, 2015 in the House:
- Executive Session: 2/17/2015 11:00 AM LOB 308
On January 30, 2015 in the House:
- ==CANCELED== Executive Session: 2/4/2015 2:00 PM LOB 308
On January 26, 2015 in the House:
- ==RESCHEDULED== Public Hearing: 1/28/2015 1:30 PM LOB 308
On January 21, 2015 in the House:
- ==POSTPONED== Public Hearing: 1/27/2015 1:30 PM LOB 308
On January 8, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced and Referred to Election Law; HJ 12, PG. 216
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor