+ − Actions (13)
On April 26, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by Governor Sununu 04/23/2021; Chapter 10; Eff: 06/22/2021
On April 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Enrolled RC 24Y-0N, MA, (In recess of 04/08/2021); SJ 12
On April 12, 2021 in the House:
- Enrolled (in recess of) 04/09/2021 HJ 7 P. 99
On March 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Ought to Pass: RC 24Y-0N, MA; OT3rdg; 03/25/2021; SJ 9
On March 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 03/25/2021; Vote 5-0; CC; SC 16
On March 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Remote Hearing: 03/17/2021, 09:45 am; Links to join the hearing can be found in the Senate Calendar; SC 15
On March 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced 03/04/2021 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; SJ 7
On February 24, 2021 in the House:
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 2021-0296h: MA VV 02/24/2021 HJ 3 P. 13
- Amendment # 2021-0296h: AA VV 02/24/2021 HJ 3 P. 13
On February 17, 2021 in the House:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2021-0296h (Vote 20-0; CC) HC 12 P. 9
On February 3, 2021 in the House:
- Executive Session: 02/11/2021 01:00 pm Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/98476278055
On January 21, 2021 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 01/28/2021 10:00 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/96195399441 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened.
On January 9, 2021 in the House:
- Introduced (in recess of) 01/06/2021 and referred to Labor, Industrial and Rehabilitative Services HJ 2 P. 42
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor