+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On October 29, 2013 in the House:
- Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Jan 8 (Vote 21-0; CC)
On September 4, 2013 in the House:
- Retained Bill - Executive Session: 10/10/2013 11:00 AM LOB 210-211
On August 26, 2013 in the House:
- Retained Bill - Division II Subcommittee Work Session: 9/17/2013 11:00 AM LOB 209
On March 19, 2013 in the House:
- Retained in Committee
On March 12, 2013 in the House:
- Executive Session: 3/19/2013 10:00 AM LOB 210-211
On March 8, 2013 in the House:
- Division II Work Session: 3/14/2013 10:00 AM LOB 209
On March 6, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Finance; HJ 24, PG.671
- Ought To Pass: MA VV; HJ 24, PG.671
On February 12, 2013 in the House:
- Committee Report: Ought To Pass for Mar 6 (Vote 11-8; Part I RC); HC 20, PG.416
On February 7, 2013 in the House:
- Executive Session: 2/12/2013 1:45 PM LOB 207
On January 23, 2013 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 1/31/2013 1:15 PM LOB 207
On January 3, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced 1/3/2013 and Referred to Education; HJ 12, PG.190