+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (13)
On July 12, 2023 in the House:
- Signed by Governor Sununu 06/30/2023; Chapter 127; Eff: 01/01/2024 HJ 17
On June 20, 2023 in the House:
- Enrolled (in recess of) 06/15/2023 HJ 16 P. 14
On June 20, 2023 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Adopted, VV, (In recess 06/15/2023); SJ 20
On May 11, 2023 in the Senate:
- Ought to Pass: MA, VV; OT3rdg; 05/11/2023; SJ 14
On April 18, 2023 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 05/11/2023; Vote 5-0; CC; SC 21
On April 18, 2023 in the House:
- Introduced (in recess of) 01/05/2023 and referred to Ways and Means HJ 3 P. 10
On March 22, 2023 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 03/29/2023, Room 103, SH, 09:30 am; SC 15
On March 14, 2023 in the Senate:
- Introduced 03/09/2023 and Referred to Ways and Means; SJ 10
On March 9, 2023 in the House:
- Amendment # 2023-0237h: AA VV 03/09/2023 HJ 8 P. 12
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 2023-0237h: MA VV 03/09/2023 HJ 8 P. 11
On February 27, 2023 in the House:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2023-0237h 02/15/2023 (Vote 20-0; CC) HC 14 P. 8
On February 9, 2023 in the House:
- Executive Session: 02/15/2023 10:00 am LOB 202-204
On January 25, 2023 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 01/31/2023 10:00 am LOB 202-204